Post: #1

etu multiply chesina anwer okkate chudandi

12 x 42 = 504
21 x 24= 504

14 x 82 = 1148
41 x 28 = 1148

12 x 63 = 756
21 x 36 = 756

23 x 64= 1472
32 x 46 = 1472

12 x 84 = 1008
21 x 48 = 1008

23 x 96 = 2208
32 x 69 = 2208

13 x 62 = 806
31 x 26 = 806

24 x 84 = 2016
42 x 48 = 2016

13 x 93 = 1209
31 x 39 = 1209

34 x 86 = 2924
43 x 68 = 2924

Quote this message in a replyReply

Post Reply 


Forum Jump:


User(s) browsing this thread: 1 Guest(s)